Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/04/2007