Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2008