Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/12/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/23/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/23/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/25/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/25/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/01/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/27/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/01/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/23/2008