Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 08/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/04/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/21/2008