Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/10/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/23/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/11/2007