Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/14/2008