Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 08/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/25/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/08/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/24/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/24/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/27/2008