Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/07/2007