Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/2008