Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 08/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/04/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/11/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2008