Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/23/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/31/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/31/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/16/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/10/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/15/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/16/2008