Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/17/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/19/2008