Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/22/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/24/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/31/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/15/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/11/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/11/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/22/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/23/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/26/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/08/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/18/2008