Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/23/2007