Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/07/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/04/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/04/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/16/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/12/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/18/2008