Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/30/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/30/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/30/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/30/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/30/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/30/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/30/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 08/01/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 08/02/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/02/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/04/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/04/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/07/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/20/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/25/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/23/2008