Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/12/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/29/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/16/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2008