Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/24/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/26/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/30/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/30/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/31/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/01/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 08/02/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/02/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/09/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/09/2008