Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/03/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/13/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/11/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/09/2008