Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/02/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2008