Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/25/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/17/2007