There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 954 Wheeling Avenue in Cambridge, Ohio, as the "John Herschel Glenn, Jr. Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/24/2007Became Public Law No: 110-104. (TXT | PDF)
10/24/2007Signed by President.
10/15/2007Presented to President.
10/03/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12692-12693)
09/26/2007Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
09/05/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10102)
07/16/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/24/2007Became Public Law No: 110-104. (TXT | PDF)
10/24/2007Signed by President.
10/15/2007HousePresented to President.
10/04/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/03/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12692-12693)
09/26/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395.
09/26/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
09/26/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/06/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/05/2007-1:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/05/2007-1:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10102)
09/05/2007-12:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3052.
09/05/2007-12:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10102-10103, H10103-10104)
09/05/2007-12:49pmHouseMr. Welch (VT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/19/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/19/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/16/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/16/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/16/2007 Referred to
07/19/2007 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/06/2007 Referred to
09/26/2007 Markup by
09/26/2007 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3052.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3052. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-104 (10/24/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 954 Wheeling Avenue in Cambridge, Ohio, as the "John Herschel Glenn, Jr. Post Office Building."