Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/16/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/16/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/16/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/16/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/23/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/31/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/10/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/10/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/11/2008