Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/10/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2008