Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/18/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/25/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/12/2007