Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/31/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/31/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/31/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 08/02/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2007