There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the award of contracts to provide guard services under the contract security guard program of the Federal Protective Service to a business concern that is owned, controlled, or operated by an individual who has been convicted of a felony.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/08/2008Became Public Law No: 110-356. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2008Signed by President.
09/30/2008Presented to President.
09/27/2008Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10140)
09/23/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9336; text as passed Senate: CR S9336)
09/11/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 110-455.
10/02/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11108)
09/14/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-328.
07/17/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/08/2008Became Public Law No: 110-356. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2008Signed by President.
09/30/2008HousePresented to President.
09/27/2008-10:46amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2008-10:46amHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10140)
09/27/2008-10:36amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3068.
09/27/2008-10:36amHouseMs. Norton moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10140-10141)
09/26/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/2008SenateSenate requests return of papers with respect to H.R. 3068 by Unanimous Consent.
09/24/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9336; text as passed Senate: CR S9336)
09/11/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 953.
09/11/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 110-455.
07/30/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/03/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/02/2007-1:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/02/2007-1:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11108)
10/02/2007-1:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3068.
10/02/2007-1:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11108-11109)
10/02/2007-1:20pmHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 204.
09/14/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-328.
08/02/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/02/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/01/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
08/01/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
07/18/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/17/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/17/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1543)
07/17/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/17/2007 Referred to
08/02/2007 Markup by
09/14/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-328
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management07/18/2007 Referred to
08/01/2007 Markup by
08/01/2007 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/03/2007 Referred to
07/30/2008 Markup by
09/11/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-455

No related bill information was received for H.R.3068.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3068. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-356 (10/08/2008)

Federal Protective Service Guard Contracting Reform Act of 2008 - Requires the Secretary of Homeland Security, acting through the Assistant Secretary of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, to promulgate regulations establishing guidelines for the prohibition of contract awards for the provision of guard services under the contract security guard program of the Federal Protective Service to any business concern that is owned, controlled, or operated by an individual who has been convicted of a felony. Authorizes the Secretary to consider permanent or interim prohibitions when promulgating the regulations.

Requires such regulations to: (1) identify which serious felonies may prohibit a contractor from being awarded a contract; (2) require contractors to provide information regarding any relevant felony convictions when submitting bids or proposals; (3) provide guidelines for the contracting officer to assess present responsibility, mitigating factors, and the risk associated with the previous conviction and to award a contract under certain circumstances.

Requires the Administrator for Federal Procurement Policy to report on establishing similar guidelines government-wide to the House Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs and the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.