Committees: H.R.3068 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/17/2007 Referred to
08/02/2007 Markup by
09/14/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-328
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management07/18/2007 Referred to
08/01/2007 Markup by
08/01/2007 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/03/2007 Referred to
07/30/2008 Markup by
09/11/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-455