Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/18/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/25/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/05/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/18/2007