There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote freedom and democracy in Vietnam.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/18/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 3 (Roll no. 877).(text: CR 9/17/2007 H10385-10387)
07/19/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/19/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/18/2007-3:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2007-3:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 3 (Roll no. 877). (text: CR 9/17/2007 H10385-10387)
09/18/2007-3:21pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10481)
09/17/2007-3:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/17/2007-2:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3096.
09/17/2007-2:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10385-10391)
09/17/2007-2:51pmHouseMr. Faleomavaega moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/31/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/31/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/19/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/19/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/19/2007 Referred to
07/31/2007 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations09/19/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3096. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/18/2007)

Vietnam Human Rights Act of 2007 - Title I: Prohibition on Nonhumanitarian Assistance to the Government of Vietnam - (Sec. 101) Prohibits U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to the government of Vietnam for FY2008 in excess of FY2007 levels unless the President certifies to Congress that the government of Vietnam has made substantial progress respecting: (1) the release of political and religious prisoners; (2) the right of religious freedom, including the return of church properties; (3) the rights of ethnic minorities; and (4) access to U.S. refugee programs by Vietnamese nationals.

Prohibits U.S. nonhumanitarian assistance to the government of Vietnam for subsequent fiscal years in excess of FY2007 levels unless the President certifies to Congress that in addition to such requirements: (1) no government of Vietnam official, agency, or entity wholly or partly owned by the government of Vietnam was complicit in a severe form of trafficking in persons; or (2) the government of Vietnam took all appropriate steps to end any such complicity and hold any official, agency, or entity accountable for such conduct.

Authorizes the President to waive such prohibition for reasons of national interest.

Title II: Assistance to Support Democracy in Vietnam - (Sec. 201) Authorizes the President to provide assistance through nongovernmental organizations and the Human Rights Defenders Fund for the support of individuals and organizations to promote human rights in Vietnam.

Authorizes FY2008-FY2009 appropriations.

Title III: United States Public Diplomacy - (Sec. 301) States that it is U.S. policy to take necessary measures to overcome government of Vietnam jamming of Radio Free Asia.

Authorizes FY2008-FY2009 appropriations for such activities.

(Sec. 302) States that it is U.S. policy that educational and cultural exchange programs with Vietnam should promote progress toward freedom and democracy in Vietnam.

Title IV: United States Refugee Policy - (Sec. 401) States that it is U.S. policy to offer refugee resettlement to Vietnam nationals (including members of the Montagnard ethnic minority groups) who are eligible for the Humanitarian Resettlement program, the Orderly Departure program, the Resettlement Opportunities for Vietnamese Returnees program, the Amerasian Homecoming Act of 1988, or any other U.S. refugee program, but who were deemed ineligible for reasons of administrative error or certain circumstances beyond their control.

Authorizes funds to be made available from FY2008-FY2010 Department of State refugee assistance for the protection and resettlement of Vietnamese refugees and asylum seekers, including Montagnards in Cambodia.

Title V: Annual Report on Progress Toward Freedom and Democracy in Vietnam - (Sec. 501) Directs the Secretary of State to report annually to Congress respecting activities under this Act toward freedom and democracy in Vietnam.