Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/01/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/17/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/17/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/23/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/24/2008