Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/04/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 08/04/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/04/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/04/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 08/04/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 08/04/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/04/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 10/29/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/04/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/16/2008