Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 08/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/07/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/25/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2008