Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2007