Text: H.R.3123 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (08/03/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3123

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
July 31, 2007

Received

August 3, 2007

Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary


AN ACT

To extend the designation of Liberia under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act so that Liberians can continue to be eligible for temporary protected status under that section.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension of designation.

(a) In general.—The designation of Liberia under section 244(b)(1) of the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1254a(b)(1)) is extended through September 30, 2008.

(b) Applicability.—Subsection (a) shall be applied so as to render eligible for temporary protected status and work authorization, in accordance with subsections (a), (e) and (f) of section 244 of such Act (8 U.S.C. 1254a), an alien who is a national of Liberia (or in the case of an alien having no nationality, is a person who last habitually resided in Liberia) and is otherwise eligible under subsection (c) of such section, if the alien—

(1) was granted such status under the designation of Liberia that is effective until October 1, 2007 (71 Fed. Reg. 55000);

(2) applied for such status under such designation, and such application is still pending; or

(3) is eligible for late initial registration under section 244(c) of such Act and the regulations implementing such section.

(c) Requirements.—Not later than 60 days after the date of the enactment of this Act, the Secretary of Homeland Security shall publish in the Federal Register procedures for aliens to register for temporary protected status under the extension made by this Act, and to apply for any applicable work authorization or extension of work authorization. Such registration period shall be not less than 60 days long.

(d) Extension of current work authorizations.—Notwithstanding any other provision of law, any work authorization provided under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act pursuant to the designation of Liberia that is effective until October 1, 2007, is extended until not earlier than April 1, 2008.

Passed the House of Representatives July 30, 2007.

Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
Clerk.