Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/25/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/26/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/17/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/01/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/21/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/25/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2008