Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/18/2007