Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/31/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 08/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 08/01/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/03/2007