Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/05/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/10/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/23/2008