Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2008