Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/11/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/23/2008