Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/15/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/13/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/15/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/26/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/26/2008