Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 08/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/20/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/23/2008