Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/22/2008