Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/18/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/01/2007