Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/03/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/07/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/25/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/21/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/16/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/18/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/27/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/27/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/19/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2008