There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at Highway 49 South in Piney Woods, Mississippi, as the "Laurence C. and Grace M. Jones Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-107. (TXT | PDF)
10/26/2007Signed by President.
10/24/2007Presented to President.
10/19/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/19/2007Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13167)
10/01/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11043-11044)
07/31/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-107. (TXT | PDF)
10/26/2007Signed by President.
10/24/2007HousePresented to President.
10/22/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/19/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/19/2007SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13167)
10/02/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/01/2007-3:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2007-3:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11043-11044)
10/01/2007-3:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3233.
10/01/2007-3:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11043-11044)
10/01/2007-3:45pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/20/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/31/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/31/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/31/2007 Referred to
09/20/2007 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/02/2007 Referred to
10/19/2007 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-107 (10/26/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at Highway 49 South in Piney Woods, Mississippi, as the "Laurence C. and Grace M. Jones Post Office Building."