Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/14/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/13/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/04/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/04/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/19/2008