Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/01/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008