Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/12/2007